U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MADDOX et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.