U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONEAL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.