U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:04-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Snellgrove et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.