U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Protective Order]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.