U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.