U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ZUNIGA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order to Amend Petition]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.