U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WOOD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 13, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.