U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KEOWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.