U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.