U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. EDDINGS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.