U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARAJAS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • January 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 19, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 12, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 26, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.