U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:04-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Greer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Amended Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.