U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAVE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.