U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCLEAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.