U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:11-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. THORNTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.