U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Poole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.