U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MIDDLEBROOKS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.