U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TEDRICK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.