U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.