U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REID
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.