U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KINSER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Travel]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.