U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:08-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Whisby et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.