U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00016-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Love et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2018: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • December 28, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.