U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HULING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.