U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.