U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOBBY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.