U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ISLAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.