U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-mj-00098-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AUWEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Jencks Act Materials]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.