U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOOREHEAD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 09, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.