U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:92-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.