U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOFF
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.