U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00037-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAVIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
  • June 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.