U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.