U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:04-cr-00020-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Turner et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.