U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SULLIVAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.