U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.