U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:98-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Dorsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.