U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARRIOS-HERRERA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.