U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WATERS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 01, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 13, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.