U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOCKHART et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.