U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TILLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Sealed Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Sealed Order]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Sealed Order]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Sealed Order]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.