U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00004-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Order]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Sealed Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sealed Order]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.