U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FARRELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 25, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.