U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCABE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 23, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.