U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COOK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Order]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.