U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:17-cr-00005-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GARVIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.