U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CHILDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order]
  • April 10, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.