U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.