U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HAMBY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.