U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRADLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 17, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.